HOPE AND SOUL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AND WELLBEING OF THE CHILDREN. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN TANZANIA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: -AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN TANZANIA BY PROVIDING: -HOUSING, GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Tanzania
Governance
- 14 July 2017: CIO registration
- 30 March 2023: Funds received from 1177262 JOHNNY FOUNDATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Gidney | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Gidney | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Barter | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Barter | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Bowles | Trustee | 12 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE PROSSER | Trustee | 14 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.05k | £46.97k | £73.29k | £104.26k | £130.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.62k | £41.43k | £80.41k | £101.10k | £127.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 January 2022 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 January 2022 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND SUPPORT THE WELLBEING OF THE CHILDREN AT WOMENÆS CHRISTIAN ORPHANAGE BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES [NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY] FOR EDUCATION AND WELLBEING OF THE CHILDREN. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE [UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS] IN TANZANIA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: - AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION. PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION, TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN TANZANIA BY PROVIDING: HOUSING, GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BY THE PROVISION OF REHABILITATION OR MEDICAL FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 KEATS CLOSE
WATERLOOVILLE
PO8 8LA
- Phone:
- 07972211122
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window