AUDACIOUS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Audacious Foundation works to see UK communities transformed and individuals empowered and enabled to thrive in every season of life. Our mission is to build better futures by providing practical solutions to societal challenges and fostering intentional relationships with business, government and third sector organisations that positively influence the growth of a stronger society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
220 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 July 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Andrew Keir | Chair | 26 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Mark Jonathan Foster | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Steele | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £205.79k | £181.15k | £209.33k | £232.21k | £236.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.37k | £164.42k | £191.48k | £216.76k | £216.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.52k | N/A | £1.54k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 DEC 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC (THE “OBJECTS”) 1. TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE OF NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION, EDUCATION AND TRAINING, SERVICES, MEDIATION, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT; 2.TO ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MENTORS TO GO INTO SCHOOL AND HELP CHILDREN WITH THEIR STUDIES AND PROVIDING ENGLISH LESSONS TO REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS. 3.THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO HOMELESS PEOPLE. 4.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF CHILDREN AGED BETWEEN 8 – 11 LIVING IN GREATER MANCHESTER BY THE PROVISION OF A CHILDREN’S’ HOME. 5.TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION AND SHALL OPERATE AN EQUAL OPPORTUNITIES POLICY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Audacious Foundation
Unit 6 Deva Centre
Trinity Way
Manchester
M3 7BB
- Phone:
- 01618307000
- Email:
- info@audaciousfoundation.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window