WELSH PONY RESCUE & REHOMING CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescue, rehabilitation & rehoming of abandoned & unwanted equines to alleviate suffering. In particular we rescue colts & stallions from Gelligaer & Cefn Golau Commons & promote breeding controls. We operate throughout Wales, but mainly South Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 10 January 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANN KEATING | Chair | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Louise Nightingale | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
TINA MINISTER | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.10k | £56.27k | £122.07k | £122.86k | £45.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.35k | £48.42k | £119.94k | £78.18k | £109.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 05 May 2025 | 279 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 05 May 2025 | 279 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 February 2024 | 211 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 February 2024 | 211 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 21 September 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 21 September 2022 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 09 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF PONIES AND HORSES IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS; TO PROMOTE BREEDING CONTROLS AND TO PROVIDE A WINTER FEEDING PROGRAMME FOR FERAL PONIES ON THE COMMONS WHERE FUNDING PERMITS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12A COALWAY ROAD
COALWAY
COLEFORD
GL16 7HL
- Phone:
- 07766832254
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window