RIMINGTON RECREATION ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Football,Cricket,Tennis. Children's play park.Village activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 20 August 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David James | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nick Culshaw | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rowena Culshaw | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY DUCKWORTH | Trustee | 25 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £228.56k | £35.32k | £48.95k | £47.53k | £49.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £265.85k | £22.33k | £51.77k | £49.69k | £44.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £75.54k | £19.07k | N/A | £4.80k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 29 December 2020 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 29 December 2020 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JUNE 1980
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF RIMINGTON AND MIDDOP AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS AND IN PARTICULAR TO:- (I) IMPROVE AND EXTEND EXISTING PLAYING AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES. (II) TO ENCOURAGE ALL FORMS OF RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES. (III) TO MANAGE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND REPAIR THE PLAY AREAS ESTABLISHED AND THE EQUIPMENT AND MATERIALS PROVIDED FOR THESE PURPOSES. (IV) TO ACQUIRE BY WAY OF PURCHASE, LEASE OR OTHERWISE, LAND FOR THE PURPOSE OF RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF RIMINGTON AND MIDDOP AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Pavilion
Back Lane
Rimington
CLITHEROE
BB7 4EL
- Phone:
- 01200445817
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window