HAMPSHIRE SEARCH AND RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of assistance to the Police in the search for vulnerable missing persons and community resilience
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 August 2017: CIO registration
- 26 October 2019: Funds received from 1098332 HAMPSHIRE SEARCH AND RESCUE
- HANTSAR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP EDWARD HARVEY | Chair | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Margaret Chestnutt | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Richard Cook | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Ann Hardy | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Marie Smedley | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben William Goddard | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hayward Baker | Trustee | 07 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR HALFACRE VIDLER | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.85k | £132.99k | £132.99k | £121.57k | £127.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.41k | £118.98k | £119.00k | £46.14k | £113.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £7.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.17k | £12.58k | £5.00k | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 Aug 2017 as amended on 23 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are: The preservation and protection of life and health for the public benefit in Hampshire by: • providing volunteer Lowland Search and Rescue services to Hampshire & Isle of Wight Constabulary in the search and rescue of vulnerable missing persons throughout Hampshire. In addition, and when called upon, to provide assistance to other volunteer Lowland Rescue organisations, police services and other agencies in the search and rescue of vulnerable missing persons or in the event of a local or national emergency or disaster. • providing qualified water search and rescue volunteers to assist Hampshire & Isle of Wight Constabulary in the search and rescue of vulnerable missing persons throughout Hampshire. In addition, and when called upon, provide qualified water search and rescue volunteers to assist other volunteer Lowland Rescue organisations, police services, DEFRA, local authorities and other agencies in the search and rescue of vulnerable missing persons or in the event of a local or national emergency or disaster. • training operational members in search and rescue techniques to ensure they meet the high standards required by police and the Association of Lowland Search and Rescue (ALSAR) so they can be deployed in providing assistance to police and other agencies. • raising public awareness of volunteer Lowland Search and Rescue organisations when attending local events or giving presentations. • providing services such as (but not limited to) first aid, event marshalling, and safety cover at public events, both independently and in association with other agencies and organisations, and education and training in such skills, with a view to promoting the public’s safe enjoyment of recreational pursuits.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 5, Manor Farm Buildings
Church Lane
Exton
Southampton
SO32 3NU
- Phone:
- 0330 330 9506
- Email:
- info@hantsar.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window