NORTON COLLECTION MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are for the public benefit by provision of a museum and relevant collections concerned with the history of and industrial and other heritage of Bromsgrove and its environs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 03 January 2017: Standard registration
- 14 April 2018: Funds received from 1132460 THE NORTON COLLECTION MUSEUM TRUST
- THE NORTON COLLECTION MUSEUM TRUST (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Nicholas Lowe | Chair | 02 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Dennis Norton | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Cracknell | Trustee | 02 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN WARD | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL NORTON | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN TRUSLOVE | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS CYRIL NORTON | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.38k | £11.76k | £21.21k | £28.96k | £6.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.02k | £5.23k | £29.93k | £8.05k | £7.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £9.43k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 02 October 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING IN PARTICULAR BY PROVISION OF A MUSEUM AND RELEVANT COLLECTIONS CONCERNED WITH THE HISTORY OF AND INDUSTRIAL AND OTHER HERITAGE OF BROMSGROVE AND ITS ENVIRONS. SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Norton Collection Museum
26 Birmingham Road
BROMSGROVE
Worcestershire
B61 0DD
- Phone:
- 01527836582
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window