BRISTOL VOLUNTEERS FOR DEVELOPMENT ABROAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BVDA IS A STUDENT RUN CHARITY AFFILIATED TO THE UNIVERSITY OF BRISTOL STUDENT'S UNION THAT SEEKS TO WORK TOGETHER IN PARTNERSHIP WITH NGOS, COMMUNITY-BASED ORGANISATION AND LOCAL VOLUNTEERS IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES. BVDA PROMOTES SUSTAINABILITY, BY WORKING SUCCESSIVE YEARS IN THE SAME AREA, ON PROJECTS TARGETING HEALTH, EDUCATION AND CAPACITY BUILDING INITIATIVES IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bristol City
- Nepal
Governance
- 05 June 2017: CIO registration
- 01 November 2017: Funds received from 1093476 BRISTOL VOLUNTEERS FOR DEVELOPMENT ABROAD BVDA
- BVDA (Working name)
- BRISTOL VOLUNTEERS FOR DEVELOPMENT ABROAD BVDA (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caitlin Bromfield | Trustee | 19 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vaihari Balendran | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ben Perry | Trustee | 27 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Celestine Weegenaar | Trustee | 30 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.76k | £6.38k | £885 | £2.18k | £160 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.87k | £2.42k | £2.33k | £6.67k | £1.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 August 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 06 August 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 10 August 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 10 August 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Cavendish Road
BRISTOL
BS9 4DZ
- Phone:
- 07443510682
- Email:
- trustees@bvda.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window