Financial history FOLKESTONE RUGBY FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1171276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £58.47k £95.26k £54.82k £60.92k £72.75k
Total expenditure £21.07k £18.32k £47.40k £52.45k £54.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £22.00k £2.67k N/A N/A