Trustees FOLKESTONE RUGBY FOOTBALL CLUB
Charity Number: 1171276

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liza cayley | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mark Walker | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Smith | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steve Cribbens | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH LENNON | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MARTIN PIPER PARMENTER | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
GLENN DAVID FOREMAN | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK ALAN EDWARDS | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW NICHOLAS PHILIP DAGGER | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.