THE MARGATE BOOKIE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Margate Bookie is a charity which inspires a love of reading and writing through the provision of annual literary festivals and creative courses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 25 September 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Patton | Trustee | 18 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Skinner | Trustee | 02 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA ANN KING | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.53k | £81.43k | £67.77k | £40.02k | £159.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.78k | £58.03k | £58.38k | £76.32k | £169.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £61.88k | £500 | £66.07k | £38.05k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED ON 07 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND ARTS AND CULTURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING AND PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE APPRECIATION, UNDERSTANDING AND ENJOYMENT OF LITERATURE, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND RUNNING OF AN ANNUAL LITERARY FESTIVAL IN MARGATE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 GEORGE V AVENUE
MARGATE
CT9 5RH
- Phone:
- 07973955943
- Email:
- andreas@margatebookie.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window