Financial history NATURAL VOICE NETWORK

Charity number: 1171644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £70.00k £38.85k £41.11k £72.99k £80.03k
Total expenditure £69.57k £31.67k £52.68k £82.04k £80.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A