SPINAL CARE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the relief from suffering, sickness and ill health, to provide medical aid and to protect and preserve good health by the provisions of medical supplies, services and procedures to those in need in any part of the world, for example but not limited to the provision of diagnosis, treatment and care for those with spinal conditions or diseases in India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 04 April 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHAISHAV BHAGAT | Chair | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Suruchi Karol Mehra | Trustee | 22 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kumar Kumaraswami | Trustee | 22 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JIGAR PATEL | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.15k | £0 | £12 | £8.10k | £17.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.11k | £34 | £10 | £8.09k | £84 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 12 January 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF FROM SUFFERING, SICKNESS AND ILL HEALTH, TO PROVIDE MEDICAL AID AND TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISIONS OF MEDICAL SUPPLIES, SERVICES AND PROCEDURES TO THOSE IN NEED IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, FOR EXAMPLE BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF DIAGNOSIS, TREATMENT AND CARE FOR THOSE WITH SPINAL CONDITIONS OR DISEASES IN INDIA. TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY WAY OF SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH INTO THE NATURE, CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS, PREVENTION AND CURE OF DISEASE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, FOR EXAMPLE BUT NOT LIMITED TO SPINAL RELATED ILLNESSES OR DISEASES. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL HEALTH IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TAMARISK HOUSE
SANDY LANE
BARHAM
IPSWICH
IP6 0PB
- Phone:
- 07717477469
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window