Financial history WORLD TAMILS HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1170343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £139.91k £90.53k £156.82k £171.39k £98.61k
Total expenditure £128.21k £96.79k £73.65k £100.87k £97.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £7.09k N/A