Accounts and annual returns SAY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1174389
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 01 January 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 01 January 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 01 January 2021 23 November 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 23 November 2021 22 days late
Annual return 01 January 2020 02 December 2020 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 02 December 2020 31 days late