BURY ST. EDMUNDS CRICKET CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote community participation in healthy recreation through the provision of facilities for the playing of cricket. The provision and maintenance of a community pavilion for the use of the inhabitants of Bury St Edmunds and the surrounding areas without distinction of political, religious or other opinions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 31 March 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL WHITTAKER ACII | Chair | 23 October 2008 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FREDERICK NUNN | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ERIC BARKER MBE | Trustee | 23 October 2008 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.86k | £32.60k | £72.31k | £60.10k | £80.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.01k | £24.63k | £48.02k | £62.35k | £83.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £19.41k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 OCT 2008 AS AMENDED ON 28 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED ON 22 DEC 2020
Charitable objects
THE CLUB'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: (A) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF CRICKET (B)THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE COMMUNITY PAVILION FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF BURY ST EDMUNDS AND THE LOCAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (I) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (II) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESTHORPE LODGE
WESTHORPE
STOWMARKET
IP14 4TA
- Phone:
- 07876496064
- Email:
- david@ejbarker.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window