Financial history SCROPTON RIDING FOR THE DISABLED CENTRE

Charity number: 1170646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £324.06k £284.96k £157.14k £242.51k £320.81k
Total expenditure £299.76k £238.13k £189.45k £237.57k £312.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k £24.50k N/A N/A