FND HOPE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offering Patient support and awareness through assisting patients to find help and treatment. Creation of Patient educational materials. Join Research Boards Complete Research Surveys Join Scientific Medical Registry Participate in research protocols Read published research articles Engage with Medical and Allied Health Professionals via medical conferences, meetings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 28 June 2017: CIO registration
- FND HOPE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Callum Patrick Alexander | Chair | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Mildon | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
GORDON STANLEY MATTOCKS | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Victoria Christina McKillen | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Penny Trayner | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Bishop-Laggett | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.74k | £43.10k | £71.46k | £76.02k | £120.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.40k | £20.24k | £62.94k | £51.28k | £107.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF THOSE AFFECTED BY FUNCTIONAL NEUROLOGICAL DISORDER (FND) AND THEIR FAMILIES, CARERS AND COMMUNITIES. IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1. RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC INTO THE NATURE, CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS, PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND RECOVERY OF FND THROUGH SOCIAL MEDIA, CHARITABLE EVENTS, MEDICAL CONFERENCES AND ANY OTHER EDUCATIONAL MEANS SUCH AS LEAFLETS AND BOOKLETS. 2. COORDINATING A VOLUNTARY FND PATIENTS REGISTER TO ASSIST DOCTORS IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF NEW AND ONGOING RESEARCH, PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND RECOVERY OF FND IN PARTNERSHIP WITH THE GENETIC ALLIANCE 3. WORKING WITH MEDICAL AND ALLIED HEALTH PROFESSIONALS TO PROVIDE A BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF FND, IMPROVE MEDICAL PROTOCOLS, AND PROMOTE ETHICAL STANDARDS FOR FUNCTIONAL NEUROLOGICAL DISORDER THROUGH PERSONAL CONTACT, ADVOCACY AND TRAINING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FND Hope UK
167-169 Great Portland Street
Fifth Floor
LONDON
W1W 5PF
- Phone:
- 0203 468 5571
- Email:
- fndhopeuk@fndhope.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window