Financial history STREET CHILDREN IRINGA

Charity number: 1171821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £47.54k £67.79k £42.95k £63.22k £78.70k
Total expenditure £36.30k £45.54k £67.84k £70.37k £70.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A