Financial history THE GREENWOOD CHARITABLE FOUNDATION CIO

Charity number: 1171382
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £31.84k £19.40k £24.24k £78.29k £15.01k
Total expenditure £29.13k £27.88k £21.50k £71.00k £19.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A