TRIBE FREEDOM FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Inspired by a 1,000 mile run to fight child trafficking. Our mission is to fight modern slavery and end trafficking. Funds raised are granted to inspiring projects: providing rehabilitation for victims; delivering solutions to help end modern slavery; raising awareness and increasing education. We work to raise awareness of modern slavery through regular campaigns, talks, discussions and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark David Lacey | Chair | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Wakley | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francis Richard Lake | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carly Suzanne Davies | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Fenwick | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dame Sara Joanne Thornton | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tom Stancliffe | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY BERMAN | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andy Pusey | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
GUY HACKING | Trustee | 24 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROB MARTINEAU | Trustee | 24 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £242.67k | £189.40k | £243.77k | £333.34k | £305.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.81k | £173.85k | £278.60k | £290.04k | £303.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (‘THE OBJECTS’) ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN NEED IN ENGLAND AND WALES WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING AND MODERN SLAVERY BY •PROVIDING GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS WHOSE PURPOSE IS TO RELIEVE OR PREVENT HUMAN TRAFFICKING AND MODERN SLAVERY •RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING AND MODERN SLAVERY
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRIBE Freedom Foundation
Unit 3.34
Canterbury Court
1-3 Brixton Road
LONDON
- Phone:
- 07969601998
- Email:
- tom@wearetribe.co
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window