Trustees TRIBE FREEDOM FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1172251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark David Lacey Chair 26 March 2019
None on record
Christopher Wakley Trustee 07 March 2024
None on record
Francis Richard Lake Trustee 07 March 2024
None on record
Carly Suzanne Davies Trustee 07 March 2024
None on record
Lucy Fenwick Trustee 07 March 2024
None on record
Dame Sara Joanne Thornton Trustee 06 December 2022
None on record
Tom Stancliffe Trustee 19 June 2018
None on record
JEFFREY BERMAN Trustee 22 January 2018
None on record
Andy Pusey Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
GUY HACKING Trustee 24 March 2017
None on record
ROB MARTINEAU Trustee 24 March 2017
None on record