Financial history IHEART PRINCIPLES LIMITED

Charity Number: 1173025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £927.56k £1.11m £992.51k £975.88k £311.35k
Total expenditure £738.89k £1.09m £1.09m £944.32k £419.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £382.96k £523.77k £568.64k £696.24k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £541.44k £586.55k £415.78k £278.11k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £288 N/A
Income - Other £3.16k £2.79k £8.10k £1.24k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £729.13k £1.01m £1.04m £931.33k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £9.77k £74.22k £50.96k £12.98k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.32k £4.44k £4.80k £3.36k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A