Trustees THE ODELL TRUST
Charity number: 1170810

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Masters | Chair | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Rhys Griffiths | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Darryl Susan Madeley | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Alan Smith | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
KEITH SLATER | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Peter Wardle | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Doreen Perry | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alex Roberts | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR BURGESS | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.