ALEXANDER WHITLEY DANCE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AWDC forges new choreographic territory, collaborates with leaders in design and technology and creates dance works that challenge and engage existing and new audiences. A desire to further knowledge and understanding of dance within the field as well as to the broader public is also a driving force behind the company's work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £125,230 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 February 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mahesh Ramachandra | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Toby Coffey | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hope Alexander | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Clement Ripert | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma McFarland | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Charles Edward Higham | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER MARRIS WHITLEY | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £315.42k | £316.67k | £495.29k | £381.49k | £375.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £310.16k | £300.15k | £462.13k | £386.39k | £402.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £103.25k | £87.11k | £277.06k | £30.00k | £125.23k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 February 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 February 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF CONTEMPORARY DANCE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY DEVELOPING AND PRODUCING LIVE PUBLIC PERFORMANCES AND RELATED WORKSHOPS, MASTER CLASSES AND RESIDENTIAL COURSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
JERWOOD DANCEHOUSE
FOUNDRY LANE
IPSWICH
IP4 1DW
- Phone:
- 07880744906
- Email:
- contact@alexanderwhitley.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window