NORWICH FILM FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE HIGH STANDARDS OF THE ART OF CINEMA, VISUAL ART AND CINEMATOGRAPHY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN AND AROUND THE NORFOLK AREA BY PROVIDING AND PROMOTING A PROGRAMME OF SCREENINGS OF FILMS BY INTERNATIONAL, NATIONAL & LOCAL FILM-MAKERS AND ASSOCIATED EVENTS TO ENCOURAGE THE PUBLIC TO ENGAGE WITH, AND EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ON, THE ART OF CINEMA, VISUAL ART & CINEMATOGRAPHY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 July 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr KEITH MARK JOHNSTON | Chair | 21 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Simon De-lacy Adams | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Martin | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Gray | Trustee | 05 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beth Sowersby | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ellie Nixon | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.34k | £51.67k | £54.88k | £64.21k | £56.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.11k | £40.91k | £64.67k | £56.37k | £52.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 04 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 04 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE HIGH STANDARDS OF THE ART OF CINEMA, VISUAL ART AND CINEMATOGRAPHY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN AND AROUND THE NORFOLK AREA BY PROVIDING AND PROMOTING A PROGRAMME OF SCREENINGS OF FILMS BY INTERNATIONAL, NATIONAL AND LOCAL FILM-MAKERS AND ASSOCIATED EVENTS TO ENCOURAGE THE PUBLIC TO ENGAGE WITH, AND EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ON, THE ART OF CINEMA, VISUAL ART AND CINEMATOGRAPHY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Larking Gowen LLP
1st Floor Prospect House
Rouen Road
NORWICH
NR1 1RE
- Phone:
- 07743420361
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window