BEDFORD TOWN BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Brass Band
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 May 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin William Orr | Chair | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daniel James Hutchins | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Francis | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew George Bradburn | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Barlow | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Avril Reeves | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Anne Fisher | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mollie Muzzlewhite | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alice Muzzlewhite | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Thomas Berrington | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Gadsden | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
GERARD THOMAS ATKINS | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL RIGGETT | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
GEOFF GAYLOR | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA FERNAND | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
KAREN LOUISE NUTTING | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.08k | £9.66k | £8.20k | £25.57k | £22.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.15k | £8.19k | £8.49k | £31.27k | £22.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 25 May 2017
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE AND EDUCATE MEMBERS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE MUSICAL ARTS WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO MUSIC PRESENTED BY BRASS BANDS, BY MEANS OF CONCERTS, CONTESTS AND OTHER RELATED ACTIVITIES, KEEPING THE TRADITIONS OF BRASS BANDING IN ENGLAND. (2) TO EDUCATE MEMBERS AND PROSPECTIVE MUSICIANS OF ALL AGES IN THE SKILLS, ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC AS PERFORMED BY TRADITIONAL BRASS BANDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 WILLOUGHBY CLOSE
GREAT BARFORD
BEDFORD
MK44 3LD
- Phone:
- 01234 870610
- Email:
- g.gaylor@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window