BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR AMERICAN STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education through the promotion of American studies for the public benefit (through conferences, publication, and support of research, teaching and access to archives and information about the United States).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 November 2016: CIO registration
- 05 November 2018: Funds received from 1002816 BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR AMERICAN STUDIES
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Michael James Collins | Chair | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr William David James Rees | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
David John Malcolm | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam David Burns | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Riziki Elizabeth Teresia Millanzi | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Timothy Ballantyne | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Stone | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Wills | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Lloyd | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katherine Jernigan Ballantyne | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hilary Emmett | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Emily Brady | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Dossett | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Ann Hall | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachele Jacovella Allegra Dini | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elsa Devienne | Trustee | 03 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.46k | £130.32k | £115.25k | £210.48k | £114.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.17k | £59.15k | £57.16k | £208.46k | £164.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 December 2023 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 December 2023 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 24 NOV 2016 AMENDED ON 09 MAY 2017 as amended on 14 Jun 2021 as amended on 11 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
“THE PURPOSE OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF AMERICAN STUDIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: •THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF RESEARCH, TEACHING, EDUCATION AND PUBLICATION, PARTICULARLY IN THE UK; •THE HOLDING OF AMERICAN STUDIES CONFERENCES; •THE COLLECTION AND PRESERVATION OF DOCUMENTS AND ARTEFACTS RELATING TO THE UNITED STATES IN THE UK; •THE SUPPORT OF ACCESS TO ARCHIVES AND INFORMATION ABOUT THE UNITED STATES; •THE BROADENING OF KNOWLEDGE ABOUT THE UNITED STATES WITHIN THE UK; •THE PURSUIT OF ANY OTHER ACTIVITIES PROMOTING AMERICAN STUDIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
Liverpool John Moores University
John Foster Building
80-98 Mount Pleasant
LIVERPOOL
L3 5UZ
- Phone:
- 0151 231 5147
- Email:
- secretary@baas.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window