Financial history DHAMMAKAYA EUROPE INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 1171318
Charity reporting is up to date (127 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £147.92k £219.98k £242.60k £144.53k £100.28k
Total expenditure £150.72k £108.86k £165.14k £153.12k £196.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.00k N/A N/A N/A