THERAPIES UNITE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assist in the treatment and care of sufferers from mental or physical illness or disability of any description, by the provision of facilities for work and recreation, in Mexico. Promote and protect the physical and mental health of sufferers of mental and physical illness or disability in Mexico. To advance education in all areas relating to mental and physical illness or disability, in Mexico.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Mexico
Governance
- 19 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emil Prysak | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gaynor-Kay Barrow | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Meehan | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ERIC BROWN | Trustee | 16 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA ANNE ELIZABETH PAULING | Trustee | 16 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.17k | £16.17k | £11.09k | £7.81k | £15.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.19k | £18.10k | £12.24k | £7.96k | £14.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Feb 2018 as amended on 19 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL ILLNESS OR DISABILITY IN MEXICO THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PHYSIOTHERAPY, FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, EQUIPMENT, SUPPORT, EDUCATION, PRACTICAL ADVICE AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR WORK AND RECREATION, IN MEXICO.
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 BOUGHTON STREET
WORCESTER
WR2 4HE
- Phone:
- 07854822457
- Email:
- director@therapiesunite.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window