THE VICTORIA WOOD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Victoria Wood Foundation was set up after the death of Victoria Wood. It seeks to support the areas of the arts that Victoria was interested in in her lifetime, and in the parts of the country where she spent most of her life, in and around London and in the North of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 November 2016: Standard registration
- THE VICTORIA WOOD CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVINA JANE WALTER | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Jane Wymark | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Ansbro | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Lilley | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Piers John Wenger | Trustee | 08 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE ROSE SCOTT | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROGER PHILIP GLOSSOP | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.70k | £202.80k | £141.63k | £130.00k | £107.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £367.44k | £429.74k | £224.34k | £238.61k | £284.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 27 August 2024 | 204 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 27 August 2024 | 204 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 20 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 22 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
TO APPLY INCOME AND CAPITAL TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
PLUMPTON HOUSE
BENTS DRIVE
SHEFFIELD
S11 9RN
- Phone:
- 07715593995
- Email:
- cathyedis@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window