ZAYNAB SALMASI CARDIOVASCULAR INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1170885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Main objects are: - to prevent, diagnose and manage cardiovascular diseases (CVD) including hypertension and or associates risk factors and promote research and teaching in areas, countries and populations which are in need to such services. - provide financial support to those people who are in need to achieve the objective as aforesaid above.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Iraq

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 December 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr ABDUL MAJEED SALMASI Chair 13 September 2014
None on record
CHRISTINE BALL Trustee 13 September 2014
None on record
Dr MOHAMMAD YOUSEF BILAL SALMASI Trustee 13 September 2014
None on record
IMAD KADHUM BURHAN Trustee 13 September 2014
None on record
NAJLA SALMASI M.PHARM Trustee 13 September 2014
None on record
Dr ZAHRA SALMASI-RADI Trustee 13 September 2014
SMILE AGAIN
Received: On time
SAJIDA SALMASI Trustee 13 September 2014
None on record
Dr HUDA SALMASI Trustee 13 September 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £2.00k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 April 2025 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 April 2025 442 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 GOLF ROAD
LONDON
W5 3AR
Phone:
07753196929
Website:

No information available