THE UNITED KINGDOM NETWORK OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR PSYCHOLOGICAL AND SOCIAL APPROACHES TO PSYCHOSIS.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to improve the experience of people with psychosis, and their family and friends, and we support the efforts of people who share this aim. We aim to promote dialogue and understanding between different perspectives on the nature of psychosis and different ways of working with psychosis. We aim to increase access to a wide range of therapeutic approaches: psychological, social and creative
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 March 2017: CIO registration
- 05 December 2019: Funds received from 1098909 THE UNITED KINGDOM NETWORK OF THE INTERNATIONAL SO...
- ISPS UK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jacqueline Dillon | Chair | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Macintosh | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dorothee Bonnigal-Katz | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jill Hemmington | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Paul Downer | Trustee | 18 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Pons | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eamonn Michael Flynn | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
NEIL JAMES CATON | Trustee | 08 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JEN KILYON | Trustee | 31 August 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.68k | £14.08k | £15.05k | £8.87k | £8.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.76k | £20.54k | £13.84k | £14.01k | £17.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
A)OR THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC HEALTH AND FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH PSYCHOSES. B)OR THE RELIEF OF NEED OF THE FAMILIES AND CARERS OF PERSONS WITH PSYCHOSES. C)OR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING PSYCHOSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ISPS UK
61 Bridge Street
KINGTON
Herefordshire
HR5 3DJ
- Phone:
- 07936308473
- Email:
- admin@ispsuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window