MISSIONARY SISTERS OF OUR LADY OF AFRICA CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Missionary Sisters of Our Lady of Africa (also known as the White Sisters) is to support the religious and other charitable works carried on by the members of the Congregation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 January 2017: CIO registration
- 13 June 2017: Funds received from 228983 MISSIONARY SISTERS OF OUR LADY OF AFRICA (ALSO KNO...
- THE WHITE SISTERS (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sister MARIE JEANETTE MCDONALD | Chair | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sister CATHERINE MURIEL BOOTH | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sister MARIE-ALICE TERRETTAZ | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sister DAPHNE ANNE ALPHONSO | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
SISTER SALVINA FARRUGIA | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £310.48k | £278.92k | £338.77k | £217.57k | £378.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £398.54k | £364.46k | £327.82k | £359.51k | £368.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION THROUGH THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CONGREGATION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 13
Montpelier Court
Montpelier Road
London
W5 2QN
- Phone:
- 02089986731
- Email:
- ukmsolareg@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window