MIDDLETON TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the blind or partially blind or those labouring under some temporary or permanent incapacity or disability which makes reading a strain, by the provision of recorded tapes. (For further details see clause 2 of rules)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Rochdale
Governance
- 18 March 1980: Standard registration
- 30 November 2010: Removed (Voluntary removal)
- MIDDLETON TALKING NEWSPAPER (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.90k | £1.54k | £1.40k | £1.73k | £760 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.36k | £1.44k | £2.24k | £1.32k | £700 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 24 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 02 February 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 04 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 30 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 10 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 27 JUNE 1979
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND OR THE PARTIALLY BLIND OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF RULES)
Area of benefit
MIDDLETON AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window