THE KAILASH SATYARTHI CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATION / TRAINING /THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR SAVING OF LIVES / DISABILITY /THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY / HUMAN RIGHTS / RELIGIOUS OR RACIAL HARMONY / EQUALITY OR DIVERSITY CHILDREN / YOUNG PEOPLE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 16 December 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vinni Bhandari | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kailash Satyarthi | Trustee | 16 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUDHIR MAHESHWARI | Trustee | 16 December 2016 |
|
|||||
MINTOO BHANDARI | Trustee | 16 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.80k | £70.74k | £1.26k | £900 | £900 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1.1 TO PROMOTE THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF CHILDREN (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS, THE UNITED NATIONS CONVENTION ON THE RIGHTS OF THE CHILD AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF CHILD SLAVERY, TRAFFICKING AND EXPLOITATIVE LABOUR AND THEIR FAMILIES; (B) RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES CONCERNING CHILD SLAVERY, TRAFFICKING AND EXPLOITATIVE LABOUR; (C) RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES CONCERNING CHILD SLAVERY, TRAFFICKING AND EXPLOITATIVE LABOUR; (D) PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF VICTIMS OF CHILD SLAVERY, TRAFFICKING AND EXPLOITATIVE LABOUR; (E) PROMOTING RESPECT FOR THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF VICTIMS OF CHILD SLAVERY, TRAFFICKING AND EXPLOITATIVE LABOUR AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; 3.1.2 TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF VICTIMS OF CHILD SLAVERY, TRAFFICKING AND EXPLOITATIVE LABOUR AND THEIR FAMILIES; 3.1.3 TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF CHILD SLAVERY, TRAFFICKING AND EXPLOITATIVE LABOUR AND THEIR FAMILIES; 3.1.4 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF VICTIMS OF CHILD SLAVERY, TRAFFICKING AND EXPLOITATIVE LABOUR AND THEIR FAMILIES; 3.1.5 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC REGARDING THE CAUSES, MANIFESTATIONS AND IMPACT OF CHILD SLAVERY, TRAFFICKING AND EXPLOITATIVE LABOUR; AND 3.1.6 SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. 3.2 IN FURTHERANCE OF THOSE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS. 3.3 NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 UPPER WIMPOLE STREET
FLAT 1
LONDON
- Phone:
- 07584655566
- Email:
- mintoo.bhandari@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window