THE YOUTH COUNSELLING PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Youth Counselling Project provides the funds for school based counselling by specialist counsellors to young people. The service offers emotional support in a safe and professional space where children can talk about their problems without shame or discrimination. Funds are raised through grant applications and local fund raising, and administered by Trustees and volunteers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £12,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 02 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIA HANCOCK | Chair | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Myriam Otoide | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Lock | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Campbell | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michele Findlay | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Vaesen | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.00k | £42.00k | £61.27k | £58.59k | £104.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.00k | £34.00k | £40.28k | £57.12k | £51.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £500 | N/A | £2.50k | £12.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 05 June 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 05 June 2020 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN ATTENDING EAST SUSSEX PRIMARY AND SECONDARY SCHOOLS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PSYCHOTHERAPEUTIC COUNSELLING SERVICES. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF TEACHERS, GOVERNORS, SUPPORT STAFF AND PARENTS AND CARERS IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES EXPERIENCED BY CHILDREN ATTENDING EAST SUSSEX PRIMARY AND SECONDARY SCHOOLS, BY THE PROVISION OF PROFESSIONAL TRAINING AND SUPPORT SERVICES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Upper Belgrave Road
SEAFORD
BN25 3SQ
- Phone:
- 07432 872231
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window