Accounts and annual returns SMARDEN PRE-SCHOOL CIO

Charity number: 1170852
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 13 November 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 July 2020 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 June 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 April 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 29 April 2018 On Time