RAINBOW HORSES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise money to allow children and young people with autism and similar conditions to access equine assisted therapeutic learning. We operate in the East Midlands.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
- Rutland
Governance
- 12 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORNA CLAIRE JAGGARD | Chair | 21 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Grace Mock | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Susan Martin | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.23k | £0 | £689 | £325 | £400 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.00k | £0 | £0 | £719 | £50 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 December 2020 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 December 2020 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR HORSE RIDING TO PROMOTE THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS THE CHARITY WILL ENABLE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE • AUTISM • SOCIAL /EMOTIONAL AND/OR COMMUNICATION DIFFICULTIES • ATTACHMENT ISSUES • EXPERIENCED TRAUMA TO ACCESS EQUINE ASSISTED LEARNING OR EQUINE ASSISTED THERAPY
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 PENARTH GARDENS
NOTTINGHAM
NG5 4EG
- Phone:
- 0115 924 5552
- Email:
- lorna@jaggard.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window