MERTHYR TYDFIL HERITAGE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Heritage Conservation and Regeneration
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 14 September 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MORGAN JOHN CHAMBERS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rob Edward Thomson | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Dawson | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM CONNOLLY | Trustee | 18 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Norman Davies | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Derek Games | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Mary Connolly | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN JACOB | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|||||
DR HEFIN JONES OBE | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Davies | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR JOE ENGLAND | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £3.00k | £3.00k | £250 | £750 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £40 | £489 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 April 2024 | 167 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2023 | 221 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 AUGUST 1979
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF MERTHYR TYDFIL AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE WHATEVER OF THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURA AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND MERTHYR TYDFIL IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS AND ARTEFACTS OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR OF HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST AND ALSO TO IMPROVE, CONSERVE AND PROTECT THE ENVIRONMENT THERETO. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM.)
Area of benefit
MERTHYR TYDFIL AND THE NATION AT LARGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Uplands
Vaynor Lane
Cefn Coed
Merthyr Tydfil
CF48 2HE
- Phone:
- 01685386501
- Email:
- mog.chambers@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window