Financial history REACH OUT - SUPPORT IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1171740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.86k £2.86k £6.97k £11.57k £6.19k
Total expenditure £0 £609 £2.40k £5.14k £5.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A