JUSTICE MEXICO NOW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Justice Mexico Now -JMN- aims to raise awareness of the human rights violations happening in Mexico, to end corruption and impunity surrounding the Mexican state and to support victims of violence in Mexico. Our mission is to call out human rights abuses and demand an end to impunity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Mexico
Governance
- 28 March 2018: CIO registration
- JMN (Working name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAURA ALVAREZ TONIS M.A. | Chair | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CHANTER GREGG | Trustee | 23 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Rupert Knox | Trustee | 23 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
GUADALUPE VALDEZ CASTILLA M.A. | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
LAURA ORTIZ MORALES | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.84k | £4 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.94k | £50 | £52 | £55 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: · MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; · OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; · RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; · RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; · PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; · CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; · COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; · RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; · PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; · PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; · INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; · ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
JUSTICE MEXICO NOW
75-77 ST. JOHN STREET
LONDON
EC1M 4NN
- Phone:
- 07895309256
- Email:
- info@justicemexiconow.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window