LYMPHOMA OUT LOUD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lymphoma Out Loud is an educational and awareness charity for young people under the age of 30. We are a small but mighty team with one very simple and important message ?be body brave?! We provide a support network of advice and information shared amongst like-minded individuals who are experiencing similar situations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 September 2017: Standard registration
- LUMPED WITH LYMPHOMA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Becs Cox | Chair | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Liam Barlow | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
FRANCESCA WOODHOUSE | Trustee | 08 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
CASSANDRA WOODHOUSE | Trustee | 08 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/05/2020 | 19/05/2021 | 19/05/2022 | 19/05/2023 | 19/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.54k | £18.36k | £16.52k | £13.85k | £18.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.25k | £11.72k | £10.36k | £6.50k | £8.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 May 2024 | 15 April 2025 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 May 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 May 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 May 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 May 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 APR 2017 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AMONG YOUNG ADULTS BY THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC EVENTS AND ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO RAISE AWARENESS OF LYMPHOMA AND OF APPROPRIATE SELF-EXAMINATION PROCEDURES AND RECOGNITION OF EARLY SYMPTOMS OF LYMPHOMA TO ASSIST IN THE EARLY DETECTION, TREATMENT AND CURE OF LYMPHOMA. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE “YOUNG ADULTS” ARE DEFINED AS BEING PERSONS AGED BETWEEN 18 AND 30.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAN Mezzanine
7-14 Great Dover Street
London
SE1 4YR
- Phone:
- 07872631600
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window