THE STATHERN CHILDREN'S HOLIDAY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Run school clubs and subsidised holidays at Stathern Lodge or similar places, for children from socially/economically disadvantaged areas of Nottingham. Help them make use of their talents to be positive members of their community, gaining self-confidence & cooperative skills; in accordance with Christian principles Give city children experience of the countryside Train community volunteers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 November 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
33 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 09 January 2017: CIO registration
- SCHF (Working name)
- STATHERN CHILDRENS HOLIDAYS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN ANN RUBEN | Chair | 12 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
KIERAN CHRISTOPHER BECKETT SHEEHAN | Trustee | 17 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Stephen ZAKARIAN | Trustee | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Anne Jordan | Trustee | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DANIELLE DEAKIN | Trustee | 28 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN BRETT | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN RUBEN | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nathaniel Deakin | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|||||
MELISSA ANN CARVER | Trustee | 12 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
KELLY LAURA BRETT | Trustee | 12 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/11/2019 | 01/11/2020 | 01/11/2021 | 01/11/2022 | 01/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.40k | £1.10k | £361 | £8.88k | £9.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.97k | £420 | £496 | £8.68k | £11.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2022 | 08 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2022 | 08 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2019 | 03 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2019 | 03 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SCHF ARE: TO ADVANCE IN LIFE, RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AND HELP CHILDREN FROM SOCIALLY AND/OR ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED OR DISADVANTAGED AREAS OF NOTTINGHAM AND NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: - PROVIDING SUBSIDISED OR FREE HOLIDAYS USING THE FACILITIES OF STATHERN LODGE (BRAITHWAITE GOSPEL TRUST) OR SIMILAR PLACES PROVIDING ACCOMMODATION AND ACTIVITIES, FOR THEIR BENEFIT, THAT PROMOTE SELF-CONFIDENCE AND COOPERATIVE SKILLS, IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES; - GIVING CITY CHILDREN EXPERIENCE OF THE COUNTRYSIDE AND HELPING THEM MAKE EFFECTIVE USE OF THEIR TALENTS TO BECOME POSITIVE MEMBERS OF THEIR COMMUNITY; AND BY - PROVIDING TRAINING FOR COMMUNITY VOLUNTEERS (INCLUDING IN SAFEGUARDING) WITH THE AIM TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES SO THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO SUPPORT THE CHILDREN IN THEIR CARE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 WAYTE COURT
RUDDINGTON
NOTTINGHAM
NG11 6NL
- Phone:
- 07788452271
- Email:
- SCHF17@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window