WEST OXFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE MAIN ACTIVITY IS TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE WEST OXFORD COMMUNITY CENTRE. THIS INCLUDES PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR WEST OXFORD RESIDENTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,570 from 1 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 14 February 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REBECCA HUXLEY | Chair | 05 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Hart | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Bussell | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Whitaker | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerry June Wright-Lynes | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Saman Jamshidifard | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Rosalyn Kilbee | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Bird | Trustee | 10 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN REID | Trustee | 05 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JOHN BOURNE | Trustee | 05 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
JIM MCMAHON | Trustee | 05 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHAN SAUNDERS | Trustee | 05 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE SIDDLE | Trustee | 05 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.58k | £102.12k | £101.36k | £107.05k | £109.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.80k | £95.19k | £90.67k | £117.87k | £121.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.37k | £37.80k | £32.49k | £4.67k | £3.57k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, NATIONALITY, AGE, DISABILITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, PARTICULARLY FOR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES, WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS B) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT, OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS C) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST OXFORD COMMUNITY CENTRE
BOTLEY ROAD
OXFORD
OX2 0BT
- Phone:
- 01865245761
- Email:
- info@woca.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window