THE NOTTINGHAM BRIDGE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Runs regular bridge drives, provides course in bridge for beginners and improves, encourages participation in competitive events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 02 December 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr DAVID HAROLD DUNFORD | Chair | 25 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sheilagh Mary Resnick | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Goodwin | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Mckee | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joan Margaret Litchfield | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Anthony McCormack | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stefka Samus | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marc Yves Denis Gaudart | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Scott | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susanna Hollins | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP GROSS | Trustee | 25 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Thomas Treharne | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.97k | £36.93k | £37.29k | £33.99k | £43.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.70k | £22.82k | £43.78k | £39.31k | £29.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 Dec 2016 as amended on 21 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT BY PROMOTING THE GAME OF BRIDGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF NOTTINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. 2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE LEARNING, TEACHING AND PLAYING OF BRIDGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF NOTTINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
401 MANSFIELD ROAD
NOTTINGHAM
NG5 2DP
- Phone:
- 01159607992
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window