AVALON CAMPS 2017

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Avalon Camps is a local charity based in Somerset, which gives disadvantaged children from Bristol, between the ages of 8 and 9, an opportunity to have a holiday in the countryside.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 21 March 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lewis Richard Coulson | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Sander Harper | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tim Weigold | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN OSBORNE BSC | Trustee | 17 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
George Osborne | Trustee | 17 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.99k | £809 | £452 | £503 | £2.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.82k | £534 | £1.01k | £1.45k | £12.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 FEB 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN FROM SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED URBAN FAMILIES, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR SUCH CHILDREN TO HAVE A FREE HOLIDAY UNDER CANVAS IN THE COUNTRYSIDE AND TAKE PART IN LINKED RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES WITH NO PARENTAL FINANCIAL CONTRIBUTION
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Croft
Littlemoor Road
Mark
HIGHBRIDGE
Somerset
TA9 4NG
- Phone:
- 01278641551
- Email:
- contact@avaloncamps.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window