Financial history COMMON CHANGE UK

Charity number: 1171076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £18.34k £20.59k £35.40k £46.49k £61.70k
Total expenditure £7.55k £9.91k £24.24k £35.78k £51.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A