CATERHAM & DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of 8 talks on a variety of topics per year, outings to places of interest such as National Trust properties, Gardens, seaside resorts and ports, guided London walks such as the Suffragette and Hugenot tours, the Supreme Court, Houses of Parliament, social events such as lunches, quizzes, theatre and cinema trips, an annual holiday, and access to 50 groups offering different subjects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £450 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 23 March 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Knight | Chair | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Lawson | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sheila Frost | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Corrie Ball | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Speed | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rita Dael | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Peter Jessop | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Whittaker | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Eileen Jessop | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Bruce Johnson | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.90k | £6.54k | £9.37k | £16.44k | £18.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.36k | £8.75k | £8.40k | £12.74k | £15.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £450 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 NOV 2014
Charitable objects
A TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE NO LONGER IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN CATERHAM, OXTED, WARLINGHAM, CHALDON, COULSDON, KENLEY, SANDERSTEAD AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. B THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
79 Hamsey Green Gardens
WARLINGHAM
Surrey
CR6 9RT
- Phone:
- 11
- Email:
- caterhamu3a@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window