WHITE ROSE CAT WELFARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity dedicated to the neutering of feral cats our purpose is to advise and guide the public as to the need to neuter ferals and to help them where possible with this by loaning trapping equipment, helping them to trap, securing neutering funding and providing temporary accommodation for contained ferals both post and pre neutering. We operate from a property at 241 Broadgate, PE12 0LT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 February 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YVONNE HUSBAND | Chair | 28 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
LEE ALAN JOHNSON | Trustee | 28 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOAN MARSHALL | Trustee | 28 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
SASHA ELOISE JOHNSON | Trustee | 28 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROSALYN JANE TURNER | Trustee | 28 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.79k | £3.66k | £1.46k | £425 | £200 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.82k | £4.06k | £1.54k | £694 | £416 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 11 March 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 11 March 2023 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 August 2021 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 21 August 2021 | 197 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF CATS AND KITTENS IN LINCOLNSHIRE AND CAMBRIDGESHIRE WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) THE RESCUE, REHABILITATION AND REHOMING OF ABANDONED CATS AND KITTENS B) THE NEUTER AND RELEASE OF FERAL CATS TO HUMANELY CONTROLLED COLONIES C) THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO CAT WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG CATS AND KITTENS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
241 BROADGATE
SUTTON ST. EDMUND
SPALDING
PE12 0LT
- Phone:
- 01945700765
- Email:
- whiterosecats@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window