INTERMEDIARIES FOR JUSTICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of need of vulnerable people (including witnesses, complainants and defendants) and the promotion of the sound administration of the law by facilitating communication and the provision of evidence in the justice system through promoting the work of intermediaries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CATHERINE O'NEILL | Chair | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Heather Carroll | Trustee | 14 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Hayman | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Lynch | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Spicer | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Hughes | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Stewart | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Castellano | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.99k | £36.52k | £35.94k | £32.70k | £27.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.73k | £23.70k | £23.03k | £25.19k | £22.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 14 June 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 14 June 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 December 2023 | 202 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 19 December 2023 | 202 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Apr 2018 as amended on 19 Feb 2020 as amended on 27 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE RELIEF OF NEED OF VULNERABLE PEOPLE (INCLUDING WITNESSES, COMPLAINANTS AND DEFENDANTS) AND THE PROMOTION OF THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW BY FACILITATING COMMUNICATION AND THE PROVISION OF EVIDENCE IN THE JUSTICE SYSTEM THROUGH PROMOTING THE WORK OF INTERMEDIARIES REGISTERED EITHER WITH THE MINISTRY OF JUSTICE (ENGLAND & WALES), THE NORTHERN IRELAND DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OR NON-REGISTERED INTERMEDIARIES WHO HAVE ATTENDED A COURSE OF SPECIALISED TRAINING FROM ACKNOWLEDGED TRAINERS IN THE FIELD AND WHO ARE ABLE TO SATISFY THE COURT OF THEIR QUALIFICATIONS AND SUITABILITY. “VULNERABLE” MEANING CHILDREN UNDER 18 (ELIGIBLE FOR INTERMEDIARY ASSISTANCE BY VIRTUE OF THEIR AGE) AND ADULTS WHOSE AGE, DISABILITY, PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISORDER, MENTAL HEALTH OR SPECIFIC LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AFFECT THEIR UNDERSTANDING OR ABILITY TO COMMUNICATE IN WORDS."
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 567
BECKENHAM
BR3 9LY
- Phone:
- 07956280367
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window